Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Pierre-Louis de La Rochefoucauld-Bayers

Deceased

Bishop of Saintes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1744BornBlanzaguet-Saint-Cybard-le-Peyrat
14 Oct 178137.0SelectedBishop of Saintes, France
10 Dec 178137.2ConfirmedBishop of Saintes, France
6 Jan 178237.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saintes, France
2 Sep 179247.9DiedBishop of Saintes, France
17 Oct 1926Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Pierre-Louis de La Rochefoucauld-Bayers:
Bishop Bl. Pierre-Louis de La Rochefoucauld-Bayers (born , died ) Bishop of Saintes

  • a bishop for 10.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013