Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ferdinand Loy, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect of Xinjiang-Urumqi [Sinkiang]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1892BornHüls, Germany
191321.0ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
14 Nov 192028.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
20 Nov 193139.8AppointedSuperior of Sinkiang [Xinjiang-Urumqi], China
21 May 193846.3AppointedPrefect of Xinjiang-Urumqi [Sinkiang], China
23 Jun 196977.4DiedPrefect of Xinjiang-Urumqi [Sinkiang], China

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Loy:
Priest Ferdinand Loy S.V.D. (born , died ) Prefect of Xinjiang-Urumqi [Sinkiang]

  • a priest for 48.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013