Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Lösch von Hilkershausen

Deceased

Bishop of Freising, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Feb 1552SelectedBishop of Freising, Germany
11 May 1552ConfirmedBishop of Freising, Germany
12 Jun 1552Ordained BishopBishop of Freising, Germany
8 Apr 1559DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Leo Lösch von Hilkershausen (VIAF: 80442956)
Bishop Leo Lösch von Hilkershausen (died ) Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Freising, Diocese of Freising

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1552, Number 8
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Number 5,504

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 6 Sep 2020

Quantcast