Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Angelin Maurice Lovey, C.R.B. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Canons Regular of the Hospitaller Congregation of Great Saint Bernard


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1911BornOrsières
8 Sep 193220.8Solemn ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Hospitaller Congregation of Great Saint Bernard
26 Jun 193826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Hospitaller Congregation of Great Saint Bernard
15 Oct 195240.9SelectedSuperior General of Canons Regular of the Hospitaller Congregation of Great Saint Bernard
17 Nov 195241.0ConfirmedSuperior General of Canons Regular of the Hospitaller Congregation of Great Saint Bernard
199179.1ResignedSuperior General of Canons Regular of the Hospitaller Congregation of Great Saint Bernard
15 Jun 200088.6DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Canons Regular of the Hospitaller Congregation of Great Saint Bernard

MicroData Summary for Angelin Maurice Lovey:
Priest Angelin Maurice Lovey C.R.B. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Canons Regular of the Hospitaller Congregation of Great Saint Bernard

  • a priest for 62.0 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013