Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Nicolas François de Lorraine-Vaudémont

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Toul

Titular See: (never ordained; never received a deaconry; resigned Cardinalate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1609BornFrance
31 Aug 16199.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Toul, France
14 Sep 162414.8SucceededBishop of Toul, France
19 Jan 162616.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Aug 162717.7Elevated to Cardinal
4 Mar 163424.2ResignedBishop-Elect of Toul, France
27 Jan 167060.1DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Toul, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas François de Lorraine-Vaudémont:
Layman Nicolas François de Lorraine-Vaudémont (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Toul

  • a cardinal for 8.1 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013