Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Lombardo

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jan 1573AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
30 Mar 1579AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
23 Jan 1585AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
13 Sep 1597DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Lombardo
Archbishop Antonio Lombardo (died ) Archbishop of Messina

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 239, and Page 242
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 99
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,573, Number 5*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast