Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Antoni Łodziński, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

Titular Bishop of Gerasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1692³BornKeten
2 Feb 171522.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 172936.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
3 Mar 172936.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerasa
1743¹50.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Józef Antoni Łodziński:
Bishop Józef Antoni Łodziński O.F.M. Conv. (born , died 1743) Auxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

  • a priest for 27.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 208
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015