Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria (Pietro a Alcantara) de Leonardi, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

Titular Bishop of Sinopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1663BornMezzomerico
28 Apr 170440.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India
28 Apr 170440.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinopoli
27 Jun 170642.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinopoli
1707²43.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria (Pietro a Alcantara) de Leonardi:
Bishop Giovanni Maria (Pietro a Alcantara) de Leonardi O.C.D. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 356
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,687

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013