Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan (Janusz) z Książąt Litewskich

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1499Born
23 Sep 151920.7AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
1531¹32.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
15 Mar 153637.2AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
18 Feb 153839.1DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan (Janusz) z Książąt Litewskich:
Bishop Jan (Janusz) z Książąt Litewskich (born , died ) Bishop of Poznań

  • a bishop for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 279, and Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013