Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marijan Lisnjić, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Makarska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1609BornImota
1634²24.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Feb 166454.7AppointedBishop of Makarska, Croatia
3 Mar 168676.8DiedBishop of Makarska, Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marijan Lisnjić:
Bishop Marijan Lisnjić O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Makarska

  • a priest for 52.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013