Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigismund von Lindenau

Deceased

Bishop of Merseburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1484¹Born
3 Apr 153551.2SelectedBishop of Merseburg, Germany
14 Jun 153551.4ConfirmedBishop of Merseburg, Germany
4 Jan 154460.0DiedBishop of Merseburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sigismund von Lindenau (VIAF: 11669333)
Bishop Sigismund von Lindenau (born 1484, died ) Bishop of Merseburg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1535, Number 14*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017