Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Livizzani Mulazzani

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1688Born
26 Nov 175365.6Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 175365.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
20 Mar 175466.0DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Livizzani Mulazzani
Giuseppe Cardinal Livizzani Mulazzani (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Italy

  • a cardinal for .3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018