Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Christoph von Liechtenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1591Born
16 Jun 162129.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
2 Jun 162432.4AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
15 Jul 162432.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
1 Dec 164351.9DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Christoph von Liechtenstein (VIAF: 72180908)
Bishop Johann Christoph von Liechtenstein (born , died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeifers

  • a priest for 22.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast