Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Marien Libri, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Superior of Upper Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1875BornNapolano, Italy
26 Aug 189924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
10 Jul 192247.5AppointedSuperior of Upper Egypt, Egypt

MicroData Summary for Marien Libri:
Priest Marien Libri O.F.M. (born ) Superior of Upper Egypt

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013