Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Leynagh

Deceased

Bishop of Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Mar 1323AppointedBishop of Lismore, Ireland
17 Apr 1323Ordained BishopBishop of Lismore, Ireland
25 Dec 1354³DiedBishop of Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Leynagh
Bishop John Leynagh (died ) Bishop of Lismore

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWaterford, Diocese of Waterford

  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 308
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,960

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast