Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bogusław Leszczyński

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645BornRadzymin
28 Mar 167126.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Apr 167833.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 168742.9SelectedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
11 Oct 168843.7ConfirmedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
8 Sep 169146.6DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Bogusław Leszczyński:
Bishop Bogusław Leszczyński (born 1645, died ) Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a priest for 13.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 248
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015