Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Humbert Leonardi, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Dariensis


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Nov 1474AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
16 Nov 1474AppointedTitular Bishop of Dariensis
23 Nov 1474Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dariensis
6 Jul 1489AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
3 Dec 1492AppointedTitular Bishop of Dariensis
1496²DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Humbert Leonardi (VIAF: 42232560)
Bishop Humbert Leonardi O. Carm. (died 1496) Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHospice Teutonique, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLiège, Diocese of Liège

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 143, and Page 105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1474, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 17 Nov 2018

Quantcast