Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert de Lénoncourt

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jul 1484AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
28 Mar 1509AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
25 Sep 1532DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Robert de Lénoncourt
Archbishop Robert de Lénoncourt (died ) Archbishop of Reims

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284, and Page 285
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 321
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 258
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1484, Number 39*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast