Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Robert Cardinal de LÚnoncourt

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1485BornLorraine
10 May 153550.4AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
20 Dec 153854.0Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 154055.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
10 Oct 154762.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare
30 May 155065.4ResignedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
22 Apr 155166.3AppointedAdministrator of Metz, France
11 Dec 155570.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
16 Dec 155571.0ResignedAdministrator of Metz, France
23 Mar 155671.2AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
4 Oct 155671.8AppointedAdministrator of Auxerre, France
7 Feb 156075.1ResignedArchbishop of Embrun, France
7 Feb 156075.1ResignedAdministrator of Auxerre, France
7 Feb 156075.1AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
13 Mar 156075.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
4 Feb 156176.1DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

MicroData Summary for Robert de LÚnoncourt:
Cardinal Robert de LÚnoncourt (died ) Archbishop of Arles

  • a cardinal for 22.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1538
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 190

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013