Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Lennan

Deceased

Bishop of Dromore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1743¹Born
20 Sep 176926.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 176926.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 178037.9AppointedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
1785¹42.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dromore, Ireland
22 Jan 180158.0DiedBishop of Dromore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthew Lennan
Bishop Matthew Lennan (born 1743, died ) Bishop of Dromore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallymoney, Co. Down
Ordained BishopStrabane, Co. Tyrone

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 201
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 180
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 52
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast