Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Zoltan Lengyel

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Romania (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1908Born
24 Jan 193122.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 193931.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Romania (Armenian)
5 Oct 196456.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Romania (Armenian)

MicroData Summary for Zoltan Lengyel
Father Zoltan Lengyel (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Romania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSatu Mare
Death PlaceSatu Mare

  • a priest for 33.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 6 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast