Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Lencastre, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1653³Born
25 Jan 170652.6AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
27 Sep 171360.3DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Lencastre
Bishop Pedro de Lencastre O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Elvas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 195
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018