Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon le Maire, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jan 1353AppointedBishop of Dol, France
30 Jan 1357AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
20 Jun 1360DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Simon le Maire
Bishop Simon le Maire O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Chartres

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 225, and Page 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast