Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johann Leisentrit

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
May 1527Born
Mar 154921.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 155932.3SelectedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
Feb 156032.7ConfirmedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
24 Nov 158659.5DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Leisentrit
Father Johann Leisentrit (born May 1527, died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlomouc

  • a priest for 37.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast