Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino de Leis, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Oct 1501AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
8 Jan 1504AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
19 Jan 1504AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
23 Feb 1504AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
6 Jan 1506DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino de Leis
Bishop Bernardino de Leis C.R.L. (died ) Bishop of Cagli

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 157, and Page 147
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 214, and Page 220
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1501, Number 25*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast