Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Béla Norbert Legányi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Pannonhalma, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1906Born
29 Jun 193024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
11 Nov 195751.4AppointedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary
Jan 1969³62.6ResignedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary
13 May 198780.9DiedAbbot Emeritus of Pannonhalma, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Béla Norbert Legányi
Abbot Béla Norbert Legányi O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Pannonhalma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudapest

  • a priest for 56.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1967

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018