Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Leitão de Carvalho, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Beja, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1742³Born
2 Mar 176522.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
8 May 180259.4SelectedBishop of Beja, Portugal
9 Aug 180259.6ConfirmedBishop of Beja, Portugal
14 Nov 180259.9Ordained BishopBishop of Beja, Portugal
21 Sep 180663.7DiedBishop of Beja, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Leitão de Carvalho
Bishop Francisco Leitão de Carvalho O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Beja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLamego

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 70
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018