Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fergus Laurence Lea

Deceased

Bishop of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644¹Born
31 Jan 169349.0SelectedBishop of Derry, Ireland
8 Feb 169450.1ConfirmedBishop of Derry, Ireland
19 Jan 169753.0DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fergus Laurence Lea
Bishop Fergus Laurence Lea (born 1644, died ) Bishop of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMostrim (Edgeworthstown), Co. Longford, Diocese of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 183
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 43
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast