Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Le Cirier

Deceased

Bishop of Avranches, France


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jun 1561AppointedBishop of Avranches, France
15 Jun 1561Ordained BishopBishop of Avranches, France
17 Jan 1575DiedBishop of Avranches, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Le Cirier
Bishop Antoine Le Cirier (died ) Bishop of Avranches

  • a bishop for 13.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 91
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,563

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017