Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de los Barrios, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1496¹Born
1 Jul 154751.5AppointedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
2 Apr 155256.2AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
22 Mar 156468.2AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
12 Feb 156973.1DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de los Barrios (VIAF: 316736556)
Archbishop Juan de los Barrios O.F.M. Obs. (born 1496, died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla de Peloche, Diocese of Badajoz, Spain
Ordained BishopToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 59, Number 332
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 197, and Page 236
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 196
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018