Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Lauri

Deceased

Bishop of Policastro, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Apr 1504AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
2 Feb 1505Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
12 Mar 1516DiedBishop of Policastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Lauri
Bishop Bernardo Lauri (died ) Bishop of Policastro

EventPlace
Ordained BishopXII Apostles, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.1 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,670
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 277
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,505, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast