Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onorato Lascaris, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1526¹Born
23 Mar 159468.2AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
2 Apr 159468.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
11 Jul 159468.5DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Onorato Lascaris
Bishop Onorato Lascaris C.R.S.A. (born 1526, died ) Bishop of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Brique, Alpes Maritimes
Ordained BishopTrinité des Monts, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceAosta, Diocese of Aosta

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 100
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018