Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jesús Langarica Olagüe, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Aguarico

Titular See: (Santos de Egüés)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1912BornEgüés, Spain
15 Aug 192917.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Jun 193523.4Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 Apr 193624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
26 Jun 197058.4AppointedPrefect of Aguarico, Ecuador
1982²69.9ResignedPrefect of Aguarico, Ecuador
29 Jan 200997.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Aguarico, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jesús Langarica Olagüe:
Father Jesús Langarica Olagüe O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Aguarico

  • a priest for 72.7 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015