Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernard Cardinal de Languisel

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Administrator of Santa Prassede


Events

DateEventTitle
1273²AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
12 Apr 1281AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
12 Apr 1281Elevated to Cardinal
5 Nov 1286AppointedAdministrator of Santa Prassede
19 Sep 1291DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard de Languisel
Bernard Cardinal de Languisel (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNīmes, Archdiocese of Toulouse, France
Death PlaceOrvieto, Diocese of Orvieto, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Franciscan, Church, Orvieto, Diocese of Orvieto, Italy

  • a cardinal for 10.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Apr 1281
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast