Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon de Langres, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vannes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
1352²AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Mar 1366AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
20 Oct 1382AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
1383²ResignedBishop of Vannes, France
7 Jun 1384DiedBishop Emeritus of Vannes, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon de Langres
Bishop Simon de Langres O.P. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vannes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 356, and Page 520

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 Sep 2020

Quantcast