Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Langelier (Lancelier)

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc, France


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Aug 1564AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
10 Jun 1565Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
24 Sep 1595DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Langelier (Lancelier)
Bishop Nicolas Langelier (Lancelier) (died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc

EventPlace
Death PlaceDinan

  • a bishop for 30.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 140
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 121
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018