Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Landi

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone

Apostolic Nuncio to Savoy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Feb 1633AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
16 Apr 1644AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
29 Jul 1646DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Landi
Bishop Giovanni Battista Landi (died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 190
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 28
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Oct 2016