Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Lancrau

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lombez, France


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Mar 1566AppointedBishop of Lombez, France
10 Nov 1597ResignedBishop of Lombez, France
18 Oct 1598DiedBishop Emeritus of Lombez, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Lancrau
Bishop Pierre de Lancrau (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lombez

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 227
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,566, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast