Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Eutrope de La Laurancie

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1740Born
19 Oct 178343.4SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
15 Dec 178343.6ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
11 Jan 178443.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
13 May 181676.0DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Eutrope de La Laurancie
Bishop Charles-Eutrope de La Laurancie (born , died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilleneuve-la-Comtesse

  • a bishop for 32.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018