Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico de Lagoria, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lavello


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Mar 1503¹AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
13 Feb 1504AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
8 Aug 1515ResignedBishop of Lavello, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico de Lagoria:
Bishop Ludovico de Lagoria O.P. Bishop Emeritus of Lavello

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 147

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013