Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo Lacabra

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579¹Born
3 Oct 163960.7AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
13 Jan 164364.0AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
23 Dec 165576.9DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Lacabra
Archbishop Bernardo Lacabra (born 1579, died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 109, and Page 129
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 168, Number 1,052
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,639, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast