Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine de La Barre

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jan 1524AppointedBishop of AngoulÍme, France
16 Mar 1528AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
12 Jan 1547DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine de La Barre
Archbishop Antoine de La Barre (died ) Archbishop of Tours

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192, and Page 321
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,524, Number 2*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast