Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Bartholomäus Kobolt von Tambach

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

Titular Bishop of Lampsacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1592BornThambach
14 Dec 163745.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
14 Dec 163745.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
1638¹45.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
5 Feb 164552.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Bartholomäus Kobolt von Tambach (VIAF: 77389822)
Bishop Johannes Bartholomäus Kobolt von Tambach (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

  • a bishop for 7.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 214
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016