Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mikołaj Kurowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1355¹Born
19 Nov 139540.8AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
26 Apr 139944.3AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
23 Jan 140247.0AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
7 Sep 141156.6DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Kurowski
Archbishop Mikołaj Kurowski (born 1355, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKurowie

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 265, and Page 534
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018