Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Kung Szu-jung

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Shanghai [Shanghai], China

Titular See: (declined nomination)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1912Born
8 Jun 193927.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 194937.4AppointedBishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China
31 Aug 200290.6DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Shanghai [Shanghai], China

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kung Szu-jung
Father Joseph Kung Szu-jung (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Shanghai [Shanghai]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWushi/Nanching
Death PlaceTaiwan

  • a priest for 63.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 13 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast