Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zweder van Kuilenburg

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Utrecht

Titular Bishop of Caesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Feb 1425AppointedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
1 Aug 1425Ordained BishopBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
10 Dec 1432ResignedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
10 Dec 1432AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
21 Sep 1433DiedBishop Emeritus of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Zweder van Kuilenburg:
Bishop Zweder van Kuilenburg (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Utrecht

  • a bishop for 8.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 491
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,698
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 253, and Page 113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013