Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Krummendiek

Deceased

Bishop of Lübeck, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1417¹Born
Mar 146649.1SelectedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
2 Jun 146649.4ConfirmedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
28 Sep 146649.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lübeck, Germany
27 Oct 148972.8DiedBishop of Lübeck, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Albert Krummendiek
Bishop Albert Krummendiek (born 1417, died ) Bishop of Lübeck

  • a bishop for 23.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 180
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1466, Number 11
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,363

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast