Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jan Ignacy Korytkowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1824Born
10 Aug 185126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
27 Apr 188863.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
27 Apr 188863.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
14 May 188863.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Ignacy Korytkowski
Father Jan Ignacy Korytkowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Gniezno e Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGniezno

  • a priest for 36.7 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018