Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florijan Korsak

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1749Born
26 Aug 177223.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 180455.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Jul 181162.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Florijan Korsak
Bishop Florijan Korsak (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog

  • a priest for 38.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018