Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Kornis de Göncz-Ruszka

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab)

Titular Bishop of Iuliopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1731BornKorod
22 Dec 175322.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 175422.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 176937.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
12 Jun 176937.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
12 Feb 179058.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Kornis de Göncz-Ruszka:
Bishop Franciscus Kornis de Göncz-Ruszka (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 35.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 247, and Page 453
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015